Refine your search

Refined by:

Michigan Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2] 03/08/2012
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 03/19/2012
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 05/08/2012
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1] 05/09/2012
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 05/15/2012
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 05/15/2012
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 05/15/2012
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 06/18/2012
Rep. Clarke, Hansen [D-MI-13] 06/18/2012