Refine your search

Refined by:

North Carolina Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 03/08/2012
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 03/08/2012
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8] 03/19/2012
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 05/08/2012
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 05/15/2012
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2] 05/15/2012
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 06/18/2012