Refine your search

Refined by:

Pennsylvania Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 03/08/2012
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3] 03/08/2012
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 03/19/2012
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 03/19/2012
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 03/19/2012
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 03/19/2012
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 05/08/2012
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 05/08/2012
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 05/09/2012
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10] 06/18/2012
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 06/18/2012
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 06/18/2012
Rep. Meehan, Patrick [R-PA-7] 06/21/2012
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 06/21/2012
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 06/29/2012