Refine your search

Refined by:

Tennessee Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Fincher, Stephen Lee [R-TN-8] 03/08/2012
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6] 03/08/2012
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4] 03/19/2012
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 05/08/2012
Rep. Fleischmann, Charles J. "Chuck" [R-TN-3] 05/09/2012
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 05/09/2012
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 05/15/2012
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 06/18/2012
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 06/29/2012