Refine your search

Refined by:

Texas Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Canseco, Francisco "Quico" [R-TX-23] 03/08/2012
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 03/08/2012
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 03/08/2012
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 03/08/2012
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 03/19/2012
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 03/19/2012
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 03/19/2012
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 05/08/2012
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 05/08/2012
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 05/09/2012
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 05/09/2012
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 05/09/2012
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 05/09/2012
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 05/09/2012
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 05/09/2012
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 05/09/2012
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 05/15/2012
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 06/18/2012
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 06/18/2012