Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 03/08/2012
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 03/08/2012
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 03/08/2012
Rep. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN-2] 03/08/2012
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 03/08/2012
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 03/08/2012
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 03/08/2012
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 03/08/2012
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 03/08/2012
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 03/08/2012
Rep. Carney, John C., Jr. [D-DE-At Large] 03/08/2012
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 03/08/2012
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-23] 03/08/2012
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 03/08/2012
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 03/19/2012
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 03/19/2012
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8] 03/19/2012
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 03/19/2012
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 03/19/2012
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 05/08/2012
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 05/08/2012
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 05/09/2012
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 05/09/2012
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 05/09/2012
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 05/09/2012
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 05/09/2012
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 05/09/2012
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 05/09/2012
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 05/09/2012
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 05/09/2012
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 05/09/2012
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 05/09/2012
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 05/09/2012
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 05/09/2012
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 05/09/2012
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 05/09/2012
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 05/09/2012
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 05/09/2012
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 05/09/2012
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 05/09/2012
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 05/09/2012
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-36] 05/09/2012
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 05/09/2012
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 05/09/2012
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 05/09/2012
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-19] 05/09/2012
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 05/09/2012
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 05/09/2012
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 05/09/2012
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 05/15/2012
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 06/18/2012
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 06/18/2012
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 06/18/2012
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 06/18/2012
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5] 06/18/2012
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 06/18/2012
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 06/18/2012
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 06/18/2012
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 06/18/2012
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 06/18/2012
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 06/18/2012
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-10] 06/18/2012
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 06/18/2012
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 06/18/2012
Rep. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM-1] 06/18/2012
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 06/18/2012
Rep. Hanabusa, Colleen W. [D-HI-1] 06/18/2012
Rep. Clarke, Hansen [D-MI-13] 06/18/2012
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 06/18/2012
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 06/18/2012
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 06/18/2012
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 06/18/2012
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 06/18/2012
Rep. Hochul, Kathleen C. [D-NY-26] 06/18/2012
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5] 06/18/2012
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 06/18/2012
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 06/18/2012
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 06/18/2012
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 06/18/2012
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 06/18/2012
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 06/18/2012
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 06/21/2012
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-33] 06/21/2012
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 06/21/2012
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 06/21/2012
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 06/21/2012
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 06/29/2012
Rep. Richmond, Cedric L. [D-LA-2] 06/29/2012
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 06/29/2012
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 06/29/2012