Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5]* 02/29/2012
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 02/29/2012
Rep. Austria, Steve [R-OH-7]* 02/29/2012
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 02/29/2012
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5]* 02/29/2012
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2] 03/16/2012
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 03/16/2012
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 03/16/2012
Rep. Critz, Mark S. [D-PA-12] 03/22/2012
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9] 04/16/2012
Rep. Amodei, Mark E. [R-NV-2] 05/10/2012