Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 01/25/2011
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26]* 01/25/2011
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 01/25/2011
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6]* 01/25/2011
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 01/25/2011
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-52]* 01/25/2011
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 01/25/2011
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large]* 01/25/2011
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4]* 01/25/2011
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11]* 01/25/2011
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1]* 01/25/2011
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 01/25/2011
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4]* 01/25/2011
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18]* 01/25/2011
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19]* 01/25/2011
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2]* 01/25/2011
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3]* 01/25/2011
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 01/25/2011
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7]* 01/25/2011
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1]* 01/25/2011
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3]* 01/25/2011
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large]* 01/25/2011
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 01/26/2011
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 01/26/2011
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 02/08/2011
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 02/08/2011
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 02/08/2011
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-24] 02/08/2011
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 02/08/2011
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 02/08/2011
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 02/08/2011
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 02/08/2011
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 02/08/2011
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 02/08/2011
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 02/08/2011
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-11] 02/09/2011
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 02/09/2011
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1] 02/10/2011
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 02/10/2011
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 02/10/2011
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 02/10/2011
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 02/17/2011
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 02/18/2011
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 02/18/2011
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 02/28/2011
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 02/28/2011
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 02/28/2011
Rep. Stutzman, Marlin A. [R-IN-3] 02/28/2011
Rep. Landry, Jeffrey M. [R-LA-3] 03/01/2011
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8] 03/01/2011
Rep. Critz, Mark S. [D-PA-12] 03/03/2011
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 03/08/2011
Rep. Yoder, Kevin [R-KS-3] 03/08/2011
Rep. Herrera Beutler, Jaime [R-WA-3] 03/10/2011
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 03/17/2011
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14] 03/31/2011
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9] 03/31/2011
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-23] 03/31/2011
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 04/04/2011
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 04/04/2011
Rep. Walsh, Joe [R-IL-8] 04/05/2011
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 04/07/2011
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 04/07/2011
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 04/08/2011
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 04/13/2011
Rep. Schilling, Robert T. [R-IL-17] 04/14/2011
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 04/15/2011
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 05/05/2011
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 05/05/2011
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 05/23/2011
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 05/23/2011
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 05/24/2011
Rep. Duffy, Sean P. [R-WI-7] 06/14/2011
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 06/28/2011
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 07/14/2011
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 08/05/2011
Rep. Gibson, Christopher P. [R-NY-20] 10/03/2011