Refine your search

Refined by:

Pennsylvania Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8]* 03/01/2012
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 04/16/2012
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 04/16/2012
Rep. Meehan, Patrick [R-PA-7] 04/26/2012
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 05/10/2012
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 07/18/2012