Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8]* 03/01/2012
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 03/08/2012
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 03/22/2012
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 03/29/2012
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 04/16/2012
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 04/19/2012
Rep. Meehan, Patrick [R-PA-7] 04/26/2012
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 04/26/2012
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 05/10/2012
Rep. Turner, Robert L. [R-NY-9] 05/10/2012
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 09/13/2012
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 09/28/2012