Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47]* 03/01/2012
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 03/01/2012
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 03/01/2012
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 03/08/2012
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 03/26/2012
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 03/26/2012
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 03/26/2012
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 03/29/2012
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 04/16/2012
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 04/16/2012
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 04/16/2012
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 04/25/2012
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 04/25/2012
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 04/26/2012
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 05/09/2012
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 05/09/2012
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 05/17/2012
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9] 05/17/2012
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-10] 05/17/2012
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 05/31/2012
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-9] 05/31/2012
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 05/31/2012
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 06/05/2012
Rep. Clarke, Hansen [D-MI-13] 06/05/2012
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48] 06/05/2012
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 06/08/2012
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 06/18/2012
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 06/19/2012
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 06/26/2012
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 07/11/2012
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 07/13/2012
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 07/23/2012
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 07/26/2012
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 07/26/2012
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 07/31/2012
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 07/31/2012
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 08/01/2012
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 08/02/2012
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 09/11/2012
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 09/11/2012
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 09/11/2012
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 09/11/2012
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 09/11/2012
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 09/21/2012
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 09/21/2012
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 09/21/2012
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 11/13/2012
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 11/13/2012
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 11/13/2012
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 11/13/2012
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 11/13/2012
Rep. Critz, Mark S. [D-PA-12] 11/13/2012
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-33] 11/13/2012
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 11/13/2012
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 11/15/2012
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 11/16/2012
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 11/28/2012
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5] 11/28/2012
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 11/30/2012
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 12/19/2012
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 12/19/2012