Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 03/01/2012
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1]* 03/01/2012
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 03/01/2012
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-52]* 03/01/2012
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14]* 03/01/2012
Rep. Schilling, Robert T. [R-IL-17]* 03/01/2012
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18]* 03/01/2012
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 03/05/2012
Rep. West, Allen B. [R-FL-22] 03/05/2012
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12] 03/05/2012
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 03/05/2012
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 03/05/2012
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-24] 03/21/2012
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 03/22/2012
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 03/26/2012
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 03/26/2012
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 03/27/2012
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 04/16/2012
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 04/16/2012
Rep. Gibson, Christopher P. [R-NY-20] 04/17/2012
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 04/17/2012
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 04/24/2012
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 04/24/2012
Rep. Yoder, Kevin [R-KS-3] 04/25/2012
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 05/08/2012
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 05/15/2012
Rep. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN-2] 05/16/2012
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 06/25/2012
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 07/09/2012
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 07/10/2012
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15] 07/12/2012
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 07/17/2012
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 07/24/2012
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 09/11/2012
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 09/12/2012