Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3]* 03/01/2012
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 03/01/2012
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3]* 03/01/2012
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2]* 03/01/2012
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 03/08/2012
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 03/08/2012
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 03/20/2012
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 03/22/2012
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 05/08/2012