Refine your search

Refined by:

Connecticut Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 03/07/2012
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 03/21/2012
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 03/27/2012
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 04/16/2012
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 04/25/2012