Refine your search

Refined by:

Illinois Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 03/07/2012
Rep. Dold, Robert J. [R-IL-10] 03/07/2012
Rep. Schilling, Robert T. [R-IL-17] 03/21/2012
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 03/21/2012
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 04/16/2012
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 04/16/2012
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 04/18/2012
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 04/27/2012
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 05/07/2012
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-11] 05/08/2012
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 05/09/2012