Refine your search

Refined by:

Michigan Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-9] 03/13/2012
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2] 03/21/2012
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 03/27/2012
Rep. Clarke, Hansen [D-MI-13] 03/27/2012
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 03/27/2012
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 04/16/2012
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 04/18/2012
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 04/18/2012
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 04/25/2012
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1] 04/25/2012