Refine your search

Refined by:

Ohio Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 03/07/2012
Rep. Renacci, James B. [R-OH-16] 03/27/2012
Rep. Austria, Steve [R-OH-7] 03/29/2012
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 04/16/2012
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 04/18/2012
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 04/27/2012
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 05/07/2012
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 05/07/2012
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 05/08/2012
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 05/08/2012
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2] 05/09/2012
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 05/09/2012
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 05/09/2012