Refine your search

Refined by:

Washington Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 03/07/2012
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 03/27/2012
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 04/18/2012
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 04/18/2012
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 04/27/2012
Rep. Herrera Beutler, Jaime [R-WA-3] 05/07/2012