Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 03/05/2012
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 03/07/2012
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 03/07/2012
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 03/07/2012
Rep. Gowdy, Trey [R-SC-4] 03/07/2012
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 03/07/2012
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-5] 03/07/2012
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 03/07/2012
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 03/07/2012
Rep. Dold, Robert J. [R-IL-10] 03/07/2012
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 03/07/2012
Rep. Rivera, David [R-FL-25] 03/07/2012
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 03/13/2012
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 03/13/2012
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17] 03/13/2012
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 03/13/2012
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1] 03/13/2012
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1] 03/13/2012
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 03/13/2012
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 03/13/2012
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 03/13/2012
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 03/13/2012
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 03/13/2012
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3] 03/13/2012
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 03/13/2012
Rep. Hurt, Robert [R-VA-5] 03/13/2012
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 03/13/2012
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 03/13/2012
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 03/13/2012
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 03/13/2012
Rep. Denham, Jeff [R-CA-19] 03/13/2012
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 03/21/2012
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-13] 03/21/2012
Rep. Runyan, Jon [R-NJ-3] 03/21/2012
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 03/21/2012
Rep. Gardner, Cory [R-CO-4] 03/21/2012
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 03/21/2012
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 03/21/2012
Rep. Schilling, Robert T. [R-IL-17] 03/21/2012
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 03/21/2012
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3] 03/21/2012
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 03/21/2012
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 03/21/2012
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2] 03/21/2012
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 03/21/2012
Rep. Brooks, Mo [R-AL-5] 03/21/2012
Rep. Pompeo, Mike [R-KS-4] 03/21/2012
Rep. Berg, Rick [R-ND-At Large] 03/21/2012
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 03/21/2012
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 03/21/2012
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 03/21/2012
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 03/27/2012
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-12] 03/27/2012
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 03/27/2012
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 03/27/2012
Rep. Yoder, Kevin [R-KS-3] 03/27/2012
Rep. Renacci, James B. [R-OH-16] 03/27/2012
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 03/27/2012
Rep. Mack, Connie [R-FL-14] 03/27/2012
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 03/27/2012
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8] 03/27/2012
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 03/27/2012
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-21] 03/27/2012
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-13] 03/27/2012
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 03/27/2012
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 03/29/2012
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1] 03/29/2012
Rep. Landry, Jeffrey M. [R-LA-3] 03/29/2012
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 03/29/2012
Rep. Adams, Sandy [R-FL-24] 03/29/2012
Rep. Fincher, Stephen Lee [R-TN-8] 03/29/2012
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 03/29/2012
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 03/29/2012
Rep. Huelskamp, Tim [R-KS-1] 03/29/2012
Rep. Austria, Steve [R-OH-7] 03/29/2012
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 03/29/2012
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3] 03/30/2012
Rep. West, Allen B. [R-FL-22] 04/16/2012
Rep. Buerkle, Ann Marie [R-NY-25] 04/16/2012
Rep. Southerland, Steve II [R-FL-2] 04/16/2012
Rep. Woodall, Rob [R-GA-7] 04/16/2012
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 04/16/2012
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 04/16/2012
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1] 04/16/2012
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 04/16/2012
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 04/16/2012
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10] 04/16/2012
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 04/16/2012
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3] 04/16/2012
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 04/16/2012
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 04/16/2012
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9] 04/16/2012
Rep. Meehan, Patrick [R-PA-7] 04/16/2012
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 04/18/2012
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 04/18/2012
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15] 04/18/2012
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 04/18/2012
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1] 04/18/2012
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16] 04/18/2012
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 04/18/2012
Rep. Young, Todd C. [R-IN-9] 04/18/2012
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 04/18/2012
Rep. Womack, Steve [R-AR-3] 04/18/2012
Rep. Turner, Robert L. [R-NY-9] 04/18/2012
Rep. Schweikert, David [R-AZ-5] 04/18/2012
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 04/18/2012
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 04/18/2012
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6] 04/18/2012
Rep. Fleischmann, Charles J. "Chuck" [R-TN-3] 04/18/2012
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 04/18/2012
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 04/18/2012
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2] 04/18/2012
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 04/18/2012
Rep. Duffy, Sean P. [R-WI-7] 04/18/2012
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 04/18/2012
Rep. Hayworth, Nan A. S. [R-NY-19] 04/18/2012
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 04/18/2012
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 04/18/2012
Rep. Reed, Tom [R-NY-29] 04/18/2012
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 04/18/2012
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 04/18/2012
Rep. Heck, Joseph J. [R-NV-3] 04/23/2012
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2] 04/25/2012
Rep. Amodei, Mark E. [R-NV-2] 04/25/2012
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 04/25/2012
Rep. Graves, Tom [R-GA-9] 04/25/2012
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 04/25/2012
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-1] 04/25/2012
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 04/25/2012
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 04/25/2012
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 04/25/2012
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1] 04/25/2012
Rep. Noem, Kristi L. [R-SD-At Large] 04/25/2012
Rep. Webster, Daniel [R-FL-8] 04/25/2012
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 04/25/2012
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 04/27/2012
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 04/27/2012
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 04/27/2012
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21] 04/27/2012
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 04/27/2012
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 04/27/2012
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 04/27/2012
Rep. Herrera Beutler, Jaime [R-WA-3] 05/07/2012
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 05/07/2012
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 05/07/2012
Rep. McCarthy, Kevin [R-CA-22] 05/07/2012
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 05/07/2012
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 05/07/2012
Rep. Guinta, Frank C. [R-NH-1] 05/07/2012
Rep. Quayle, Benjamin [R-AZ-3] 05/07/2012
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 05/07/2012
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 05/07/2012
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 05/07/2012
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-11] 05/08/2012
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 05/08/2012
Rep. Griffith, H. Morgan [R-VA-9] 05/08/2012
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-52] 05/08/2012
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4] 05/08/2012
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 05/08/2012
Rep. Roby, Martha [R-AL-2] 05/08/2012
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40] 05/08/2012
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 05/08/2012
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 05/08/2012
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 05/08/2012
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 05/08/2012
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 05/09/2012
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2] 05/09/2012
Rep. Canseco, Francisco "Quico" [R-TX-23] 05/09/2012
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 05/09/2012
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 05/09/2012