Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 03/07/2012
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2] 03/08/2012
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 03/16/2012
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 03/20/2012
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 03/21/2012
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10] 03/21/2012
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5] 03/22/2012
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 03/26/2012
Rep. Yoder, Kevin [R-KS-3] 03/26/2012
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 03/26/2012
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 03/26/2012
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 03/26/2012
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-11] 03/27/2012
Rep. Rehberg, Denny [R-MT-At Large] 03/27/2012
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 03/27/2012
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21] 03/27/2012
Rep. Buerkle, Ann Marie [R-NY-25] 03/28/2012
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 03/28/2012
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 03/28/2012
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 03/28/2012
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-23] 03/29/2012
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 03/29/2012
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16] 03/29/2012
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 03/30/2012
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 04/16/2012
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 04/16/2012
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 04/16/2012
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 04/16/2012
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 04/16/2012
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 04/16/2012
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 04/16/2012
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 04/16/2012
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17] 04/16/2012
Rep. Canseco, Francisco "Quico" [R-TX-23] 04/16/2012
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8] 04/17/2012
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 04/18/2012
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 04/18/2012
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 04/18/2012
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7] 04/18/2012
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3] 04/18/2012
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 04/18/2012
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 04/18/2012
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 04/19/2012
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 04/19/2012
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 04/19/2012
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12] 04/19/2012
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 04/19/2012
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 04/24/2012
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 04/24/2012
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 04/24/2012
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 04/24/2012
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 04/24/2012
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 04/24/2012
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 04/24/2012
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 04/24/2012
Rep. Womack, Steve [R-AR-3] 04/24/2012
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 04/24/2012
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 04/25/2012
Rep. Hanabusa, Colleen W. [D-HI-1] 04/25/2012
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 05/07/2012
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 05/07/2012
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 05/07/2012
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 05/07/2012
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 05/08/2012
Rep. Hurt, Robert [R-VA-5] 05/09/2012
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15] 05/10/2012
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 05/16/2012
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 05/16/2012
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 05/16/2012
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 05/16/2012
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 05/31/2012
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 05/31/2012
Rep. Rigell, E. Scott [R-VA-2] 06/01/2012
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 06/06/2012
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 06/20/2012