There are 3 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Preserving America's Family Farms Act

Short Titles as Introduced

Preserving America's Family Farms Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Titles as Amended by House

To prohibit the Secretary of Labor from reissuing or issuing a rule substantially similar to a certain proposed rule under the Fair Labor Standards Act of 1938 relating to child labor.

Official Title as Introduced

To prohibit the Secretary of Labor from finalizing a proposed rule under the Fair Labor Standards Act of 1938 relating to child labor.


Actions Overview (2)

Date
07/24/2012Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H5162)
03/07/2012Introduced in House

All Actions (10)

Date Chamber
07/25/2012SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
07/24/2012-4:40pmHouseThe title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection.
07/24/2012-4:40pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
07/24/2012-4:40pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H5162)
07/24/2012-4:03pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4157.
07/24/2012-4:03pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5162-5167)
07/24/2012-4:03pmHouseMr. Walberg moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
03/29/2012HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Workforce Protections.
Action By: Committee on Education and the Workforce
03/07/2012HouseReferred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce.
03/07/2012HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (95)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2]* 03/07/2012
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9] 03/22/2012
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16] 03/22/2012
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 03/27/2012
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 03/27/2012
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 03/27/2012
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 03/27/2012
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 03/27/2012
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-1] 03/27/2012
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 03/27/2012
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 03/27/2012
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 03/27/2012
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 03/27/2012
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2] 03/27/2012
Rep. Amodei, Mark E. [R-NV-2] 03/27/2012
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 03/27/2012
Rep. Canseco, Francisco "Quico" [R-TX-23] 03/27/2012
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 03/27/2012
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 03/27/2012
Rep. Lankford, James [R-OK-5] 03/28/2012
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 03/28/2012
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 03/28/2012
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 03/28/2012
Rep. Berg, Rick [R-ND-At Large] 03/29/2012
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 03/29/2012
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7] 03/29/2012
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 03/29/2012
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 03/29/2012
Rep. Noem, Kristi L. [R-SD-At Large] 03/29/2012
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 03/29/2012
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5] 03/29/2012
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 03/29/2012
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 03/29/2012
Rep. Gardner, Cory [R-CO-4] 03/29/2012
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 03/29/2012
Rep. Huelskamp, Tim [R-KS-1] 03/29/2012
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6] 03/29/2012
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 03/29/2012
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1] 03/29/2012
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 04/17/2012
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 04/17/2012
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 04/17/2012
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2] 04/17/2012
Rep. Hurt, Robert [R-VA-5] 04/17/2012
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8] 04/17/2012
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21] 04/17/2012
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8] 04/17/2012
Rep. Rehberg, Denny [R-MT-At Large] 04/17/2012
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 04/17/2012
Rep. Pompeo, Mike [R-KS-4] 04/17/2012
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 04/17/2012
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8] 04/17/2012
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-23] 04/17/2012
Rep. Womack, Steve [R-AR-3] 04/18/2012
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 04/18/2012
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 04/18/2012
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-24] 04/18/2012
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-5] 04/18/2012
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 04/19/2012
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-18] 04/19/2012
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 04/19/2012
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15] 04/25/2012
Rep. Graves, Tom [R-GA-9] 04/25/2012
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 04/25/2012
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 04/25/2012
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 04/25/2012
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 04/25/2012
Rep. Crawford, Eric A. "Rick" [R-AR-1] 04/25/2012
Rep. Griffith, H. Morgan [R-VA-9] 04/25/2012
Rep. Landry, Jeffrey M. [R-LA-3] 04/25/2012
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 04/26/2012
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 04/26/2012
Rep. Schilling, Robert T. [R-IL-17] 04/26/2012
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 04/26/2012
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4] 04/26/2012
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 04/26/2012
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3] 04/26/2012
Rep. Denham, Jeff [R-CA-19] 04/26/2012
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17] 04/26/2012
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 04/26/2012
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 04/26/2012
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-11] 04/26/2012
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 04/26/2012
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 04/27/2012
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6] 04/27/2012
Rep. Labrador, Raul R. [R-ID-1] 04/27/2012
Rep. Cravaack, Chip [R-MN-8] 04/27/2012
Rep. Hochul, Kathleen C. [D-NY-26] 04/27/2012
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 05/08/2012
Rep. Duffy, Sean P. [R-WI-7] 05/08/2012
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 05/08/2012
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10] 05/08/2012
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 05/08/2012
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-12] 05/09/2012
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 07/24/2012

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Education and the Workforce03/07/2012 Referred to
House Education and the Workforce Subcommittee on Workforce Protections03/29/2012 Referred to
Senate Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions07/25/2012 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (7)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.4157. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (07/24/2012)

Preserving America's Family Farms Act - Prohibits the Secretary of Labor from reissuing in substantially the same form, or issuing a new rule that is substantially the same as, the proposed rule "Child Labor Regulations, Orders and Statements of Interpretation; Child Labor Violations-Civil Money Penalties" (relating to child labor in agricultural and nonagricultural occupations) issued pursuant to the Fair Labor Standards Act and published on September 2, 2011.