Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2]* 03/07/2012
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9] 03/22/2012
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16] 03/22/2012
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 03/27/2012
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 03/27/2012
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 03/27/2012
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 03/27/2012
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 03/27/2012
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-1] 03/27/2012
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 03/27/2012
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 03/27/2012
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 03/27/2012
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 03/27/2012
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2] 03/27/2012
Rep. Amodei, Mark E. [R-NV-2] 03/27/2012
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 03/27/2012
Rep. Canseco, Francisco "Quico" [R-TX-23] 03/27/2012
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 03/27/2012
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 03/27/2012
Rep. Lankford, James [R-OK-5] 03/28/2012
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 03/28/2012
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 03/28/2012
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 03/28/2012
Rep. Berg, Rick [R-ND-At Large] 03/29/2012
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 03/29/2012
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7] 03/29/2012
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 03/29/2012
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 03/29/2012
Rep. Noem, Kristi L. [R-SD-At Large] 03/29/2012
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 03/29/2012
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5] 03/29/2012
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 03/29/2012
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 03/29/2012
Rep. Gardner, Cory [R-CO-4] 03/29/2012
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 03/29/2012
Rep. Huelskamp, Tim [R-KS-1] 03/29/2012
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6] 03/29/2012
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 03/29/2012
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1] 03/29/2012
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 04/17/2012
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 04/17/2012
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 04/17/2012
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2] 04/17/2012
Rep. Hurt, Robert [R-VA-5] 04/17/2012
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8] 04/17/2012
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21] 04/17/2012
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8] 04/17/2012
Rep. Rehberg, Denny [R-MT-At Large] 04/17/2012
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 04/17/2012
Rep. Pompeo, Mike [R-KS-4] 04/17/2012
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 04/17/2012
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8] 04/17/2012
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-23] 04/17/2012
Rep. Womack, Steve [R-AR-3] 04/18/2012
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 04/18/2012
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 04/18/2012
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-24] 04/18/2012
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-5] 04/18/2012
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 04/19/2012
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-18] 04/19/2012
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 04/19/2012
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15] 04/25/2012
Rep. Graves, Tom [R-GA-9] 04/25/2012
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 04/25/2012
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 04/25/2012
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 04/25/2012
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 04/25/2012
Rep. Crawford, Eric A. "Rick" [R-AR-1] 04/25/2012
Rep. Griffith, H. Morgan [R-VA-9] 04/25/2012
Rep. Landry, Jeffrey M. [R-LA-3] 04/25/2012
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 04/26/2012
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 04/26/2012
Rep. Schilling, Robert T. [R-IL-17] 04/26/2012
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 04/26/2012
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4] 04/26/2012
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 04/26/2012
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3] 04/26/2012
Rep. Denham, Jeff [R-CA-19] 04/26/2012
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17] 04/26/2012
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 04/26/2012
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 04/26/2012
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-11] 04/26/2012
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 04/26/2012
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 04/27/2012
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6] 04/27/2012
Rep. Labrador, Raul R. [R-ID-1] 04/27/2012
Rep. Cravaack, Chip [R-MN-8] 04/27/2012
Rep. Hochul, Kathleen C. [D-NY-26] 04/27/2012
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 05/08/2012
Rep. Duffy, Sean P. [R-WI-7] 05/08/2012
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 05/08/2012
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10] 05/08/2012
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 05/08/2012
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-12] 05/09/2012
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 07/24/2012