Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 01/25/2011
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 01/25/2011
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 01/25/2011
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25]* 01/25/2011
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 01/25/2011
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 01/25/2011
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 01/25/2011
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-10]* 01/25/2011
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 01/25/2011
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 01/25/2011
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36]* 01/25/2011
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2]* 01/25/2011
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5]* 01/25/2011
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 01/25/2011
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12]* 01/25/2011
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 01/25/2011
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 01/25/2011
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 01/25/2011
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 01/25/2011
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12]* 01/25/2011
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 01/25/2011
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13]* 01/25/2011
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21]* 01/25/2011
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30]* 01/25/2011
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 01/25/2011
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 01/25/2011
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 01/26/2011
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 01/26/2011
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 01/26/2011
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 01/26/2011
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 02/08/2011
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 02/08/2011
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 02/08/2011
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 02/08/2011
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 02/08/2011
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 02/08/2011
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 02/08/2011
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 03/29/2011
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-44] 10/04/2011