Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Huelskamp, Tim [R-KS-1]* 03/07/2012
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10]* 03/07/2012
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4]* 03/07/2012
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 03/08/2012
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3] 03/08/2012
Rep. Gowdy, Trey [R-SC-4] 03/08/2012
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4] 03/08/2012
Rep. Walsh, Joe [R-IL-8] 03/08/2012
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1] 03/08/2012
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 03/08/2012
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8] 03/08/2012
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 03/08/2012
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 03/08/2012
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17] 03/08/2012
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 03/08/2012
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 03/08/2012
Rep. Mulvaney, Mick [R-SC-5] 03/08/2012
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 03/16/2012
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 03/16/2012
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 03/16/2012
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 03/22/2012
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 03/22/2012
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 03/26/2012
Rep. Graves, Tom [R-GA-9] 03/29/2012
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-12] 04/16/2012
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 04/18/2012
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 04/19/2012
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8] 04/19/2012
Rep. Schweikert, David [R-AZ-5] 04/19/2012
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6] 04/24/2012
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 05/07/2012
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2] 05/07/2012
Rep. Scott, Tim [R-SC-1] 05/08/2012
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6] 05/10/2012
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 05/16/2012
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 05/31/2012
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 06/15/2012
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 06/15/2012
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 06/19/2012
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 06/20/2012
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1] 06/20/2012
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 06/26/2012
Rep. Amodei, Mark E. [R-NV-2] 07/17/2012
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4] 07/18/2012
Rep. Stutzman, Marlin A. [R-IN-3] 07/18/2012
Rep. Rigell, E. Scott [R-VA-2] 07/25/2012
Rep. Buerkle, Ann Marie [R-NY-25] 08/01/2012
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 08/01/2012