Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2]* 03/08/2012
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-23]* 03/08/2012
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17]* 03/08/2012
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 03/08/2012
Rep. Turner, Robert L. [R-NY-9]* 03/08/2012
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 03/19/2012
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14] 03/19/2012
Rep. Heck, Joseph J. [R-NV-3] 03/22/2012
Rep. Rigell, E. Scott [R-VA-2] 03/27/2012
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 04/16/2012
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 05/07/2012
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 09/11/2012