Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7]* 03/08/2012
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6]* 03/08/2012
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1]* 03/08/2012
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11]* 03/08/2012
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1]* 03/08/2012
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 03/08/2012
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 03/20/2012
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 03/22/2012
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3] 03/28/2012
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 03/28/2012
Rep. Lankford, James [R-OK-5] 04/17/2012
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 04/19/2012
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2] 06/06/2012
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15] 06/06/2012
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 06/06/2012
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 06/06/2012
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 06/06/2012
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 06/06/2012
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 06/06/2012
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 06/08/2012