Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 03/16/2012
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8] 03/16/2012
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 03/20/2012
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 03/21/2012
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 03/21/2012
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 05/09/2012
Rep. Yoder, Kevin [R-KS-3] 05/10/2012
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 05/10/2012
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-13] 05/18/2012
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8] 05/31/2012