There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title XVI of the Social Security Act to clarify that the value of certain funeral and burial arrangements are not to be considered available resources under the supplemental security income program.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
03/08/2012Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
03/13/2012Referred to the Subcommittee on Human Resources.
Action By: Committee on Ways and Means
03/08/2012Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Action By: House of Representatives
03/08/2012Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (6)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 03/20/2012
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-9] 03/20/2012
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 03/26/2012
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 03/26/2012
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 05/10/2012
Rep. Yoder, Kevin [R-KS-3] 05/10/2012

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Ways and Means03/08/2012 Referred to
House Ways and Means Subcommittee on Human Resources03/13/2012 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (3)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.4176. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (03/08/2012)

Amends title XVI (Supplemental Security Income) (SSI) of the Social Security Act to provide that the value of certain prepaid funeral and burial arrangements involving an irrevocable trust whose named beneficiary is the funeral provider are not to be considered, under the SSI program, as resources available to the individual.

Includes among such arrangements a life insurance policy irrevocably assigning benefits covering funeral goods and services to: (1) a funeral provider, or (2) an irrevocable trust fully funding such goods and services and naming the funeral provider as the trust beneficiary.