Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6]* 03/08/2012
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5]* 03/08/2012
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6]* 03/08/2012
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4]* 03/08/2012
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17]* 03/08/2012
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1]* 03/08/2012
Rep. Mulvaney, Mick [R-SC-5]* 03/08/2012
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6]* 03/08/2012
Rep. Lankford, James [R-OK-5]* 03/08/2012
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 03/08/2012
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2]* 03/08/2012
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4]* 03/08/2012
Rep. Gowdy, Trey [R-SC-4]* 03/08/2012
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26]* 03/08/2012
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large]* 03/08/2012
Rep. Walsh, Joe [R-IL-8]* 03/08/2012
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8]* 03/08/2012
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3]* 03/08/2012
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 03/08/2012
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4]* 03/08/2012
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5]* 03/08/2012
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2]* 03/08/2012
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16]* 03/08/2012
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4]* 03/08/2012
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1]* 03/08/2012
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 03/29/2012
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 03/29/2012
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 03/29/2012
Rep. Berg, Rick [R-ND-At Large] 03/29/2012
Rep. Canseco, Francisco "Quico" [R-TX-23] 03/29/2012
Rep. Duffy, Sean P. [R-WI-7] 03/29/2012
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 04/19/2012
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 04/27/2012
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9] 04/27/2012
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2] 04/27/2012
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 05/10/2012
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 05/10/2012
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 05/10/2012
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 05/11/2012
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 05/17/2012
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 05/17/2012
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 05/17/2012
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 06/21/2012
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 06/21/2012
Rep. Labrador, Raul R. [R-ID-1] 06/21/2012
Rep. Woodall, Rob [R-GA-7] 06/26/2012
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 06/26/2012
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 08/02/2012
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 12/18/2012