Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28]* 03/08/2012
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 03/08/2012
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 03/08/2012
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 03/08/2012
Rep. Critz, Mark S. [D-PA-12]* 03/08/2012
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2]* 03/08/2012
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1]* 03/08/2012
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 03/08/2012
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 03/08/2012
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53]* 03/08/2012
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16]* 03/08/2012
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12]* 03/08/2012
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 03/08/2012
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 03/08/2012
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2]* 03/08/2012
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 03/08/2012
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 03/08/2012
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15]* 03/08/2012
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 03/08/2012
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30]* 03/08/2012
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21]* 03/08/2012
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4]* 03/08/2012
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-36]* 03/08/2012
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 03/08/2012
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3]* 03/08/2012
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large]* 03/08/2012
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 03/08/2012
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 03/08/2012
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 03/08/2012
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27]* 03/08/2012
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 03/08/2012
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 03/08/2012
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 03/08/2012
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2]* 03/08/2012
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25]* 03/08/2012
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1]* 03/08/2012
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 03/22/2012
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-10] 03/22/2012
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 03/22/2012
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-19] 03/22/2012
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 04/16/2012
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 04/16/2012
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 04/17/2012
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 04/17/2012
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-10] 04/19/2012
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 04/19/2012
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 04/19/2012
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 04/19/2012
Rep. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM-1] 04/19/2012
Rep. Hanabusa, Colleen W. [D-HI-1] 04/26/2012
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 04/26/2012
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 04/26/2012
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 04/26/2012
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 04/26/2012
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 04/26/2012
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 04/26/2012
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 05/08/2012
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 05/08/2012
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 05/08/2012
Rep. Richmond, Cedric L. [D-LA-2] 05/08/2012
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5] 05/15/2012
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 05/16/2012
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 06/05/2012
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 06/27/2012
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 06/27/2012