Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1]* 03/13/2012
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3]* 03/13/2012
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2]* 03/13/2012
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24]* 03/13/2012
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8]* 03/13/2012
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 03/20/2012
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 03/20/2012
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 03/20/2012
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 03/20/2012
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 03/20/2012
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 03/20/2012
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 03/20/2012
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 03/20/2012
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 03/22/2012
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7] 03/22/2012
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-9] 03/22/2012
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 03/22/2012
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 03/22/2012
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 03/22/2012
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 03/27/2012
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 03/27/2012
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 03/27/2012
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 03/27/2012
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 03/27/2012
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 03/29/2012
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 03/29/2012
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 03/29/2012
Rep. Berg, Rick [R-ND-At Large] 03/29/2012
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 03/29/2012
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 03/29/2012
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21] 03/29/2012
Rep. Reed, Tom [R-NY-29] 03/29/2012
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31] 03/29/2012
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 03/29/2012
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 04/18/2012
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 04/18/2012
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 04/18/2012
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 04/18/2012
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 04/18/2012
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 04/18/2012
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 04/18/2012
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 04/18/2012
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 04/18/2012
Rep. Gardner, Cory [R-CO-4] 04/18/2012
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6] 04/19/2012
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 04/19/2012
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 04/19/2012
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9] 04/27/2012
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 07/10/2012
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 09/19/2012