Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Mulvaney, Mick [R-SC-5]* 03/16/2012
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-1]* 03/16/2012
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2]* 03/16/2012
Rep. Quayle, Benjamin [R-AZ-3]* 03/16/2012
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 03/27/2012
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 03/27/2012
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 03/29/2012
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 03/29/2012
Rep. Cravaack, Chip [R-MN-8] 03/29/2012
Rep. Lankford, James [R-OK-5] 03/29/2012
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 03/29/2012
Rep. Landry, Jeffrey M. [R-LA-3] 03/29/2012
Rep. Gowdy, Trey [R-SC-4] 03/29/2012
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 04/16/2012
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 04/16/2012
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2] 04/16/2012
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 04/16/2012
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 04/18/2012
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 04/25/2012