Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 03/16/2012
Rep. Young, Todd C. [R-IN-9] 04/17/2012
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 04/17/2012
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 04/17/2012
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 04/17/2012
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 04/17/2012
Rep. Critz, Mark S. [D-PA-12] 04/17/2012
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 04/17/2012
Rep. Runyan, Jon [R-NJ-3] 04/17/2012
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 04/17/2012
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 04/19/2012
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 04/19/2012
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 04/19/2012
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 04/19/2012
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 04/26/2012
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 04/26/2012
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 04/27/2012
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 04/27/2012
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 04/27/2012
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 04/27/2012
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 04/27/2012
Rep. Turner, Robert L. [R-NY-9] 04/27/2012
Rep. Meehan, Patrick [R-PA-7] 04/27/2012
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3] 04/27/2012
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 04/27/2012
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 04/27/2012
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 04/27/2012
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 04/27/2012
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 04/27/2012
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 04/27/2012
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-13] 04/27/2012
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 04/27/2012
Rep. Heck, Joseph J. [R-NV-3] 04/27/2012
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 04/27/2012
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 04/27/2012
Rep. Brooks, Mo [R-AL-5] 04/27/2012
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 04/27/2012
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 04/27/2012
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 04/27/2012
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8] 04/27/2012
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 04/27/2012
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 04/27/2012
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 04/27/2012
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 04/27/2012
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4] 04/27/2012
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 04/27/2012
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 04/27/2012
Rep. West, Allen B. [R-FL-22] 04/27/2012
Rep. Roby, Martha [R-AL-2] 04/27/2012
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 04/27/2012
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15] 04/27/2012
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-24] 04/27/2012
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-12] 04/27/2012
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9] 04/27/2012
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-52] 04/27/2012
Rep. Schilling, Robert T. [R-IL-17] 04/27/2012
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8] 04/27/2012
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-21] 04/27/2012
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 04/27/2012
Rep. Rigell, E. Scott [R-VA-2] 04/27/2012
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 04/27/2012
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 04/27/2012
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 04/27/2012
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-41] 04/27/2012
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 04/27/2012
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7] 04/27/2012
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 04/27/2012
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 04/27/2012
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 04/27/2012
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17] 05/08/2012
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-10] 05/08/2012
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6] 05/08/2012