Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12]* 03/19/2012
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 03/19/2012
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 03/19/2012
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 03/19/2012
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2]* 03/19/2012
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31]* 03/19/2012
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1]* 03/19/2012
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1]* 03/19/2012
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 03/19/2012
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 03/19/2012
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8]* 03/19/2012
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 03/19/2012
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 03/19/2012
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 03/20/2012
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 03/26/2012
Rep. Clarke, Hansen [D-MI-13] 04/26/2012
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 04/26/2012
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 05/16/2012
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 05/16/2012
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 05/16/2012
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 05/16/2012
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 05/16/2012
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 05/18/2012
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 05/18/2012
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 05/18/2012
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 05/18/2012
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 05/31/2012
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 05/31/2012
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 05/31/2012
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 05/31/2012
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 05/31/2012
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 05/31/2012
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 05/31/2012
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 06/08/2012
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 06/08/2012
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 06/19/2012
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 06/19/2012
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 06/20/2012
Rep. Hochul, Kathleen C. [D-NY-26] 06/20/2012
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 07/24/2012
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 08/02/2012
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 08/02/2012
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 09/11/2012
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 09/11/2012
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 09/11/2012
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 09/21/2012
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 10/19/2012
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 11/13/2012
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 11/15/2012
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 11/29/2012
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 12/31/2012