Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 03/19/2012
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10]* 03/19/2012
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28]* 03/19/2012
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 03/19/2012
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3] 03/28/2012
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 04/16/2012
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 04/16/2012
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 04/19/2012
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-19] 04/19/2012
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 04/19/2012
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 04/19/2012
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 04/24/2012
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 04/24/2012
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 04/24/2012
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 05/09/2012
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 05/09/2012
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 05/09/2012
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 05/09/2012
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 05/09/2012
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 05/09/2012
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 06/05/2012
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 06/07/2012
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 07/19/2012
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 07/19/2012
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 09/12/2012
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 09/12/2012
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 09/12/2012
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 09/12/2012
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 09/12/2012
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 09/12/2012
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 09/12/2012
Rep. Runyan, Jon [R-NJ-3] 09/12/2012
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 09/12/2012
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 09/12/2012
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 09/20/2012
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 09/20/2012
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 09/20/2012
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 09/20/2012
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 09/21/2012
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 09/21/2012
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 11/30/2012
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 12/11/2012
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 12/12/2012