Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 03/26/2012
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 03/29/2012
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 04/18/2012
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 04/18/2012
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4] 04/18/2012
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 04/18/2012
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 04/18/2012
Rep. Young, Todd C. [R-IN-9] 04/18/2012
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 04/27/2012
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 04/27/2012
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 04/27/2012
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 05/07/2012
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 05/08/2012
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 05/08/2012
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 05/08/2012
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 05/30/2012
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 05/30/2012
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 06/07/2012
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8] 06/19/2012
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 06/19/2012
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 06/21/2012
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-23] 06/21/2012
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 06/21/2012
Rep. West, Allen B. [R-FL-22] 06/26/2012
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 06/29/2012
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 07/12/2012
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8] 07/12/2012
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 07/19/2012
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10] 07/23/2012
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 07/25/2012
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 08/02/2012
Rep. Griffith, H. Morgan [R-VA-9] 08/02/2012
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7] 09/10/2012
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 09/10/2012
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 09/10/2012
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 09/10/2012
Rep. Amodei, Mark E. [R-NV-2] 09/11/2012
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 10/23/2012
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 11/16/2012