Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 03/03/2011
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 03/08/2011
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 04/04/2011
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 05/10/2011
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 07/20/2011
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 07/28/2011
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 10/03/2011
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 12/16/2011