Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 03/20/2012
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 03/22/2012
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-33] 04/16/2012
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 05/30/2012
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 07/11/2012
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 07/25/2012
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 12/31/2012