Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 03/27/2012
Rep. Schweikert, David [R-AZ-5] 04/17/2012
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 04/19/2012
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-1] 04/24/2012
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 04/26/2012
Rep. Quayle, Benjamin [R-AZ-3] 04/27/2012