There are 6 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (10)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

SAFE DOSES Act
Strengthening and Focusing Enforcement to Deter Organized Stealing and Enhance Safety Act of 2012

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

SAFE DOSES Act
Strengthening and Focusing Enforcement to Deter Organized Stealing and Enhance Safety Act of 2012

Short Titles as Reported to House

SAFE DOSES Act
Strengthening and Focusing Enforcement to Deter Organized Stealing and Enhance Safety Act of 2012

Short Titles as Introduced

Safe Doses Act

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

SAFE DOSES Act
Strengthening and Focusing Enforcement to Deter Organized Stealing and Enhance Safety Act of 2012

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title 18, United States Code, to prohibit theft of medical products, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (8)

Date
10/05/2012Became Public Law No: 112-186. (TXT | PDF)
10/05/2012Signed by President.
09/25/2012Presented to President.
09/22/2012Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
09/22/2012Senate Committee on the Judiciary discharged by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR 9/21/2012 S6671)
06/26/2012Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H3991-3992)
06/25/2012Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 112-549.
03/20/2012Introduced in House

All Actions (21)

Date Chamber
10/05/2012Became Public Law No: 112-186. (TXT | PDF)
10/05/2012Signed by President.
09/25/2012HousePresented to President.
09/24/2012SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
09/22/2012SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
09/22/2012SenateSenate Committee on the Judiciary discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR 9/21/2012 S6671)
06/27/2012SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
06/26/2012-3:20pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
06/26/2012-3:20pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H3991-3992)
06/26/2012-3:08pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4223.
06/26/2012-3:08pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H3991-3994)
06/26/2012-3:08pmHouseMr. Smith (TX) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
06/25/2012HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 393.
06/25/2012HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 112-549.
06/06/2012HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
06/06/2012HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
06/05/2012HouseSubcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security Discharged.
03/28/2012HouseSubcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Judiciary Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security
03/26/2012HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
03/20/2012HouseReferred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
03/20/2012HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (6)


Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary03/20/2012 Referred to
06/06/2012 Markup by
06/25/2012 Reported by H. Rept. 112-549
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security03/26/2012 Referred to
03/28/2012 Hearings by
06/05/2012 Discharged from
Senate Judiciary06/27/2012 Referred to
09/22/2012 Discharged from

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (4)

There are 4 summaries for H.R.4223. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 112-186 (10/05/2012)

(This measure has not been amended since it was passed by the House on June 26, 2012. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Strengthening and Focusing Enforcement to Deter Organized Stealing and Enhance Safety Act of 2012 or the SAFE DOSES Act - Amends the federal criminal code to prohibit, in or using any means or facility of interstate or foreign commerce: (1) embezzling, stealing, obtaining by fraud or deception, or knowingly and unlawfully taking, carrying away, or concealing a medical product that has not yet been made available for retail purchase by a consumer (pre-retail medical product); (2) knowingly and falsely making, altering, forging, or counterfeiting the labeling or documentation of such a product; (3) knowingly possessing, transporting, or trafficking in a product involved in such a violation; (4) buying or otherwise obtaining, or selling or distributing, with intent to defraud, such a product that has expired or been stolen; or (5) attempting or conspiring to commit such a violation.

Makes such a violation an aggravated offense if: (1) the defendant is employed by, or is an agent of, an organization in the supply chain for the product; or (2) the violation involves the use of violence, force, a threat of violence or force, or the use of a deadly weapon, results in serious bodily injury or death, or is subsequent to a prior conviction for an offense under this Act.

Prescribes criminal and civil penalties for violations, including a civil penalty of up to the greater of 3 times the economic loss attributable to the violation or $1 million.

Provides for civil forfeiture for any property which constitutes or is derived from proceeds traceable to such a violation.

Requires the penalties under this Act to apply for the following offenses involving a pre-retail medical product: (1) interstate and foreign travel or transportation in aid of racketeering enterprises; (2) engaging in monetary transactions in property derived from specified unlawful activity; (3) breaking into or entering carrier facilities with intent to commit larceny; and (4) the transportation, sale, or receipt of stolen property. Directs the Attorney General to give increased priority to efforts to investigate and prosecute offenses involving pre-retail medical products.

Extends provisions authorizing wiretapping and requiring victim restitution to offenses relating to theft of a pre-retail medical product.

Directs the U.S. Sentencing Commission to review and, if appropriate, amend the sentencing guidelines and policy statements applicable to offenses related to pre-retail medical product theft or robberies and burglaries involving controlled substances to reflect congressional intent that penalties are sufficient to deter and punish such offenses and to appropriately account for actual harm to the public.