Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15]* 03/20/2012
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 03/20/2012
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 03/27/2012
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 03/27/2012
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 03/27/2012
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 03/27/2012
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 03/27/2012
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 03/27/2012
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 03/27/2012
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 03/27/2012
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 03/27/2012
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 03/27/2012
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-10] 04/17/2012
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 04/17/2012
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 04/17/2012
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 04/17/2012
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 04/17/2012
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 04/17/2012
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 04/17/2012
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 04/17/2012
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 04/17/2012
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 04/27/2012
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 04/27/2012
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 04/27/2012
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 04/27/2012
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 04/27/2012
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-36] 05/07/2012
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 05/07/2012
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 05/07/2012
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 05/07/2012
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 05/07/2012
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 05/07/2012
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 05/07/2012
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 05/09/2012
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 05/16/2012
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 05/16/2012
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 05/16/2012
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 05/30/2012
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 05/30/2012
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 06/05/2012
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 06/05/2012
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 06/05/2012
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-33] 06/05/2012
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 06/05/2012
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 06/05/2012
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15] 06/05/2012
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 06/05/2012
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 06/06/2012
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 06/06/2012
Rep. Critz, Mark S. [D-PA-12] 06/20/2012
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 06/20/2012
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 06/20/2012
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 07/09/2012
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 09/14/2012
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 10/05/2012