There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Iron Dome Support Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To authorize further assistance to Israel for the Iron Dome anti-missile defense system.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
03/21/2012Introduced in House

All Actions (2)

Date
03/21/2012Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
Action By: House of Representatives
03/21/2012Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (109)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 03/21/2012
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 03/21/2012
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 03/21/2012
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1]* 03/21/2012
Rep. Buerkle, Ann Marie [R-NY-25]* 03/21/2012
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 03/27/2012
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-13] 03/27/2012
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 03/27/2012
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 03/27/2012
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-19] 03/27/2012
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 03/27/2012
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 03/27/2012
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-9] 03/27/2012
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 03/27/2012
Rep. Turner, Robert L. [R-NY-9] 03/27/2012
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-10] 03/27/2012
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 03/27/2012
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14] 03/27/2012
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 03/27/2012
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 03/27/2012
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 03/27/2012
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 03/27/2012
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 03/27/2012
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 03/27/2012
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 03/27/2012
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 03/27/2012
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 03/27/2012
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 03/27/2012
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 03/27/2012
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 03/28/2012
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 03/28/2012
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-36] 03/28/2012
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 03/28/2012
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 03/28/2012
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 03/28/2012
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 03/28/2012
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 03/28/2012
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 03/28/2012
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 03/28/2012
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 03/28/2012
Rep. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM-1] 03/29/2012
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 03/29/2012
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 03/29/2012
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 03/29/2012
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 03/29/2012
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 03/29/2012
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 03/29/2012
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2] 03/29/2012
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9] 04/16/2012
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 04/16/2012
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 04/16/2012
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 04/16/2012
Rep. Murphy, Christopher [D-CT-5] 04/16/2012
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 04/16/2012
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 04/16/2012
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 04/16/2012
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 04/16/2012
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 04/16/2012
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 04/16/2012
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10] 04/16/2012
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 04/18/2012
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 04/18/2012
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 04/18/2012
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1] 04/18/2012
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 04/18/2012
Rep. Dold, Robert J. [R-IL-10] 04/18/2012
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 04/25/2012
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large] 04/25/2012
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 04/25/2012
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 04/25/2012
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 04/25/2012
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 04/25/2012
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 04/25/2012
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 04/26/2012
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 04/26/2012
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 04/26/2012
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 04/26/2012
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 05/08/2012
Rep. Critz, Mark S. [D-PA-12] 05/08/2012
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 05/08/2012
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15] 05/08/2012
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 05/08/2012
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 05/08/2012
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 05/08/2012
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 05/09/2012
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 05/09/2012
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 05/09/2012
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 05/09/2012
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 05/09/2012
Rep. Berg, Rick [R-ND-At Large] 05/09/2012
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 05/09/2012
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 05/09/2012
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 05/09/2012
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 05/09/2012
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 05/09/2012
Rep. Rivera, David [R-FL-25] 05/09/2012
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 05/11/2012
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 05/11/2012
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 05/11/2012
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 05/15/2012
Rep. Cravaack, Chip [R-MN-8] 05/15/2012
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 05/15/2012
Rep. Clarke, Hansen [D-MI-13] 05/16/2012
Rep. Canseco, Francisco "Quico" [R-TX-23] 05/16/2012
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 05/16/2012
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 05/16/2012
Rep. Fincher, Stephen Lee [R-TN-8] 05/16/2012
Rep. Griffith, H. Morgan [R-VA-9] 09/10/2012
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 09/11/2012

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Foreign Affairs03/21/2012 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (4)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.4229. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (03/21/2012)

Iron Dome Support Act - Authorizes the President to provide assistance to the government of Israel for the procurement, maintenance, and sustainment of the Iron Dome anti-missile defense system for purposes of intercepting short-range missiles launched against Israel.