Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 03/21/2012
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 03/21/2012
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 03/21/2012
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1]* 03/21/2012
Rep. Buerkle, Ann Marie [R-NY-25]* 03/21/2012
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 03/27/2012
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-13] 03/27/2012
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 03/27/2012
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 03/27/2012
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-19] 03/27/2012
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 03/27/2012
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 03/27/2012
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-9] 03/27/2012
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 03/27/2012
Rep. Turner, Robert L. [R-NY-9] 03/27/2012
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-10] 03/27/2012
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 03/27/2012
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14] 03/27/2012
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 03/27/2012
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 03/27/2012
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 03/27/2012
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 03/27/2012
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 03/27/2012
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 03/27/2012
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 03/27/2012
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 03/27/2012
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 03/27/2012
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 03/27/2012
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 03/27/2012
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 03/28/2012
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 03/28/2012
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-36] 03/28/2012
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 03/28/2012
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 03/28/2012
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 03/28/2012
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 03/28/2012
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 03/28/2012
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 03/28/2012
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 03/28/2012
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 03/28/2012
Rep. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM-1] 03/29/2012
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 03/29/2012
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 03/29/2012
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 03/29/2012
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 03/29/2012
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 03/29/2012
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 03/29/2012
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2] 03/29/2012
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9] 04/16/2012
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 04/16/2012
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 04/16/2012
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 04/16/2012
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 04/16/2012
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 04/16/2012
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 04/16/2012
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 04/16/2012
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 04/16/2012
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 04/16/2012
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 04/16/2012
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10] 04/16/2012
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 04/18/2012
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 04/18/2012
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 04/18/2012
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1] 04/18/2012
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 04/18/2012
Rep. Dold, Robert J. [R-IL-10] 04/18/2012
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 04/25/2012
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large] 04/25/2012
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 04/25/2012
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 04/25/2012
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 04/25/2012
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 04/25/2012
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 04/25/2012
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 04/26/2012
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 04/26/2012
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 04/26/2012
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 04/26/2012
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 05/08/2012
Rep. Critz, Mark S. [D-PA-12] 05/08/2012
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 05/08/2012
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15] 05/08/2012
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 05/08/2012
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 05/08/2012
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 05/08/2012
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 05/09/2012
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 05/09/2012
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 05/09/2012
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 05/09/2012
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 05/09/2012
Rep. Berg, Rick [R-ND-At Large] 05/09/2012
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 05/09/2012
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 05/09/2012
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 05/09/2012
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 05/09/2012
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 05/09/2012
Rep. Rivera, David [R-FL-25] 05/09/2012
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 05/11/2012
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 05/11/2012
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 05/11/2012
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 05/15/2012
Rep. Cravaack, Chip [R-MN-8] 05/15/2012
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 05/15/2012
Rep. Clarke, Hansen [D-MI-13] 05/16/2012
Rep. Canseco, Francisco "Quico" [R-TX-23] 05/16/2012
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 05/16/2012
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 05/16/2012
Rep. Fincher, Stephen Lee [R-TN-8] 05/16/2012
Rep. Griffith, H. Morgan [R-VA-9] 09/10/2012
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 09/11/2012