Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17]* 03/21/2012
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 03/21/2012
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 03/26/2012
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-1] 03/27/2012
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 03/28/2012
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 03/30/2012
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 03/30/2012
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 03/30/2012
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 04/16/2012
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 04/19/2012
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 04/24/2012
Rep. Schweikert, David [R-AZ-5] 04/25/2012
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1] 04/25/2012
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2] 04/27/2012
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 05/10/2012
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 05/10/2012
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3] 05/15/2012
Rep. Hochul, Kathleen C. [D-NY-26] 05/17/2012
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 05/30/2012
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 05/31/2012