Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 03/28/2012
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 03/28/2012
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 03/29/2012
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14] 04/16/2012
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 04/16/2012
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 04/17/2012
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6] 04/17/2012
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 04/19/2012
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1] 04/25/2012
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 05/10/2012