Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19]* 03/21/2012
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 03/29/2012
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 05/07/2012
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 05/07/2012
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 05/07/2012
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 05/10/2012
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 05/31/2012
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 06/18/2012
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 06/21/2012
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 06/21/2012
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 06/27/2012
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 07/10/2012
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 07/17/2012
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 08/02/2012
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 08/02/2012
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 09/21/2012