Refine your search

7 results for Major Actions
Date Major Actions
08/16/2012 Became Public Law No: 112-172.
08/16/2012 Signed by President.
08/07/2012 Presented to President.
08/02/2012 Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote.(consideration: CR S6006)
07/18/2012 Committee on Foreign Relations. Reported by Senator Kerry without amendment. Without written report.
05/15/2012 Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H2685-2686)
03/22/2012 Introduced in House