Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 03/22/2012
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 04/19/2012
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10] 04/24/2012
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 04/24/2012
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 04/26/2012
Rep. Buerkle, Ann Marie [R-NY-25] 04/26/2012
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 04/26/2012
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 05/30/2012
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 06/29/2012