Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3]* 03/22/2012
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28]* 03/22/2012
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10]* 03/22/2012
Rep. Clarke, Hansen [D-MI-13]* 03/22/2012
Rep. Rigell, E. Scott [R-VA-2] 03/26/2012
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 03/27/2012
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 03/27/2012
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 03/28/2012
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-36] 03/28/2012
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 06/06/2012