Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Schweikert, David [R-AZ-5]* 03/26/2012
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 03/26/2012
Rep. Quayle, Benjamin [R-AZ-3]* 03/26/2012
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 03/26/2012
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6]* 03/26/2012
Rep. Gardner, Cory [R-CO-4]* 03/26/2012
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6]* 03/26/2012
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6]* 03/26/2012
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4]* 03/26/2012
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4]* 03/26/2012
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 03/26/2012
Rep. Gowdy, Trey [R-SC-4]* 03/26/2012
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 03/26/2012
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48]* 03/26/2012
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5]* 03/26/2012
Rep. Amodei, Mark E. [R-NV-2]* 03/26/2012
Rep. Berg, Rick [R-ND-At Large]* 03/26/2012
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8]* 03/26/2012
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3]* 03/26/2012
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1]* 03/26/2012
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7]* 03/26/2012
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31]* 03/26/2012
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 03/26/2012
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15]* 03/26/2012
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6]* 03/26/2012
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5]* 03/26/2012
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1] 03/29/2012
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 03/29/2012
Rep. Lankford, James [R-OK-5] 03/29/2012
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 03/29/2012
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 03/29/2012
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 03/29/2012
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 03/29/2012
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17] 03/29/2012
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 03/29/2012
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4] 03/29/2012
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3] 03/29/2012
Rep. Graves, Tom [R-GA-9] 03/29/2012
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 03/29/2012
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 03/29/2012
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1] 03/29/2012
Rep. Labrador, Raul R. [R-ID-1] 03/29/2012
Rep. Canseco, Francisco "Quico" [R-TX-23] 03/29/2012
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 03/29/2012
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 03/29/2012
Rep. Gibson, Christopher P. [R-NY-20] 03/29/2012
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2] 04/16/2012
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 04/16/2012
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 04/16/2012
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-18] 04/16/2012
Rep. Southerland, Steve II [R-FL-2] 04/16/2012
Rep. Noem, Kristi L. [R-SD-At Large] 04/16/2012
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 04/16/2012
Rep. Duffy, Sean P. [R-WI-7] 04/16/2012
Rep. West, Allen B. [R-FL-22] 04/16/2012
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2] 04/17/2012
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 04/19/2012
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 04/24/2012
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1] 04/24/2012
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 04/24/2012
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 04/24/2012
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-23] 04/25/2012
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 04/27/2012
Rep. Scott, Tim [R-SC-1] 05/07/2012
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 05/07/2012
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 05/07/2012
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-13] 05/07/2012
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 05/08/2012
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 05/10/2012
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 05/16/2012
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 05/18/2012
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 05/31/2012
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 05/31/2012
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 06/18/2012
Rep. Womack, Steve [R-AR-3] 07/10/2012
Rep. Landry, Jeffrey M. [R-LA-3] 09/19/2012
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 09/19/2012
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 09/21/2012
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8] 09/28/2012